DE SB271 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act makes a revision to the Delaware Code for the purpose of closing a loophole in the robbery first degree statute, whereby a criminal can threaten to kill someone during the course of committing theft and receive a lesser sanction than by threatening to shoot someone. Specifically, this Act makes it a crime of robbery in the first degree by threatening death upon another during the commission of robbery in the second degree, adding subsection (a)(5).
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Robbery In The First Degree.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicole Poore [D] | Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Sen. Gerald Hocker [R] | Sen. Robert Marshall [D] |
Rep. Jeffrey Spiegelman [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 36 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-28 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2016-06-21 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |