DE SB270 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Passed on October 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Passed on October 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
This Act establishes an evaluation and assessment system created by the Department of Education to determine whether a school facility is in good repair to assure that school facilities are clean, safe, and functional for staff and students. This Act also requires the Division of Public Health to create a routine indoor air quality monitoring program that includes temperature and humidity standards that is published on the Department of Health and Social Services website. It further requires the Division of Public Health to create a contractor certification program for indoor air quality services that will allow schools to contract with properly trained and certified contractors when indoor air quality remediation is necessary. The Act also provides procedures for districts to make procedures clear for receiving and reporting indoor air quality complaints in schools.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Free Public Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-03 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 33 YES 7 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-30 | Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Stricken in House | |
2022-06-30 | Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-23 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2022-06-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 13 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-08 | Assigned to Education Committee in House | |
2022-06-07 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-07 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-02 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 270, and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |