DE SB269 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-30 - Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

The Riverfront Development Corporation was created by epilogue language in the Fiscal Year 1997 Bond Bill. The Board of Directors of the Riverfront Development Corporation is established by at least three separate provisions of Bond Bill epilogue language in Senate Bill No. 260 of the 138th General Assembly (70 Del. Laws, c. 210, § 41), House Bill No. 467 of the 139th General Assembly (71 Del. Laws, c. 227, § 8), and House Bill No. 550 of the 142nd General Assembly (74 Del. Laws, c. 308, § 40).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Riverfront Development Corporation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2018-06-28 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2018-06-28 Assigned to Administration Committee in House
2018-06-27 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-27 Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-26 Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback