DE SB269 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on August 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on August 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill amends the careless or inattentive driving law by enhancing the penalty for a careless or inattentive driver who contributes to the serious physical injury of a vulnerable user in a public right of way. The Bill defines vulnerable uses in public right of ways.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Careless Or Inattentive Driving.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-07-01 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-07-01 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2010-07-01 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-07-01 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 21 YES 12 NO 5 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-07-01 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 24 YES 12 NO 3 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-07-01 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House | |
2010-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 3 On Its Merits, 3 Unfavorable | |
2010-06-16 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2010-06-15 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-01 | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate |