DE SB264 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 4 NO 3 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill permits the City Council of the City of Milford to impose and collect a lodging tax of no more than three percent on hotel and motel rooms located in the City of Milford, so long as it is approved by a majority of the City Council pursuant to the provisions of the Charter of the City of Milford.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Charter Of The City Of Milford Relating To A Lodging Tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01 Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 4 NO 3 ABSENT
2018-06-28 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 2 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2018-06-28 Assigned to Administration Committee in House
2018-06-27 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-06-27 Rules Suspended in Senate
2018-06-27 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-21 Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback