DE SB264 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill permits the City Council of the City of Milford to impose and collect a lodging tax of no more than three percent on hotel and motel rooms located in the City of Milford, so long as it is approved by a majority of the City Council pursuant to the provisions of the Charter of the City of Milford.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The City Of Milford Relating To A Lodging Tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-04 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-07-01 | Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 4 NO 3 ABSENT | |
2018-06-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 2 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-28 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2018-06-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-06-27 | Rules Suspended in Senate | |
2018-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-21 | Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate |