DE SB263 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 6 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act amends the Delaware Governmental Accountability Act to make the annual budget process part of a performance management system of strategic planning, performance metrics and performance budgeting, dedicated to continuous process improvement that makes government more efficient, reduces costs and eliminates waste in the process and operations that deliver goods and services to taxpayers, customers and employees of State government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Governmental Accountability Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26 Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 6 On Its Merits
2018-06-22 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2018-06-21 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-06-19 Introduced and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback