DE SB263 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill adds a requirement that a teacher show 2 years of satisfactory student growth within a 3 year period before the teacher may receive the highest level of notice and hearing protections.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Teacher Notice And Hearing Protections.
Sponsors
Sen. George Bunting [D] | Rep. Earl Jaques [D] | Rep. Joseph Miro [R] | Rep. Teresa Schooley [D] |
Rep. Darryl Scott [D] | Sen. David Sokola [D] | Sen. Liane Sorenson [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-22 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 2 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-15 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House | |
2010-06-10 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-10 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-10 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate | |
2010-06-02 | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2010-05-11 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |