DE SB262 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this Chapter is to ensure the safety, reliability and cost-effectiveness of rides provided by Transportation Network Company Drivers within the State of Delaware and to preserve and enhance access to these important transportation options for residents and visitors to the State. To facilitate the regulatory process in a quickly changing industry, the Division is authorized to promulgate rules and regulations to ensure compliance with this Chapter or to address new industry developments not addressed explicitly in this Chapter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 2 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Transportation Network Companies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-10SenateSigned by Governor
2016-07-01HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 34 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 5 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-06-30HouseReported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 6 On Its Merits
2016-06-29HouseIntroduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
2016-06-28SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-06-28SenateAmendment SA 5 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-06-28SenateLifted From Table in Senate
2016-06-23SenateAmendment SA 5 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
2016-06-23SenateLaid On Table in Senate
2016-06-23SenateRoll Call Rescinded in Senate
2016-06-21SenateDefeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 13 YES 8 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-06-21SenateAmendment SA 4 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 13 YES 8 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-06-21SenateAmendment SA 3 - Stricken
2016-06-21SenateAmendment SA 2 - Stricken
2016-06-21SenateAmendment SA 1 - Stricken
2016-06-21SenateAmendment SA 4 - Introduced in Senate
2016-06-21SenateLifted From Table in Senate
2016-06-16SenateLaid On Table in Senate
2016-06-09SenateAmendment SA 3 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
2016-06-09SenateAmendment SA 2 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
2016-06-09SenateAmendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
2016-06-09SenateReported Out of Committee (HIGHWAYS & TRANSPORTATION) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2016-05-12SenateAssigned to Highways & Transportation Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback