DE SB260 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

This Act provides supplementary appropriations to certain Grants-in-Aid for Fiscal Year 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Making Appropriations For Certain Grants-in-aid For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2021; Specifying Certain Procedures, Conditions And Limitations For The Expenditure Of Such Funds; Amending The Fiscal Year 2021 Appropriations Act; And Amending Certain Statutory Provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30 Signed by Governor
2020-06-29 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2020-06-29 Suspension of Rules in House
2020-06-25 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2020-06-25 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2020-06-25 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2020-06-25 Lifted From Table in Senate
2020-06-24 Introduced and Laid on Table in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback