DE SB26 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act creates a one-time $100 tax credit per unit for any business purchasing and placing an automatic external defibrillator in service in the State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Business Tax Credits And Deductions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09 Signed by Governor
2018-04-24 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-04-24 Amendment HA 1 to SB 26 - Stricken in House
2018-04-12 Amendment HA 1 to SB 26 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-28 Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2017-04-06 Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House
2017-04-05 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2017-03-30 Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2017-03-16 Introduced and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback