DE SB26 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act creates a one-time $100 tax credit per unit for any business purchasing and placing an automatic external defibrillator in service in the State.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Business Tax Credits And Deductions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-04-24 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-04-24 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 26 - Stricken in House | |
2018-04-12 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 26 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-03-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2017-04-06 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House | |
2017-04-05 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2017-03-30 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2017-03-16 | Introduced and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |