DE SB258 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill creates an additional incentive for holders of abandoned property to report such property to the state and promptly resolve such claims. Holders not currently reporting any or all amounts or types of abandoned property or already engaged in claims resolution with the State Escheator would be eligible to resolve claims before the Secretary of State in a process that would limit the reporting of abandoned property to 1996 or 1993, rather than the current obligation of holders to report abandoned property back to 1981 or those making voluntary disclosure to report abandoned property back to 1991.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 12 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Voluntary Disclosure Of Abandoned Or Unclaimed Property.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Blevins [D] | Sen. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Robert Gilligan [D] | Rep. Peter Schwartzkopf [D] |
Sen. Gary Simpson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-11 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-28 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-28 | Amendment HA 1 - Defeated in House by Voice Vote | |
2012-06-28 | Amendment HA 1 defeated | |
2012-06-27 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2012-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2012-06-26 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House | |
2012-06-21 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-21 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-21 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate | |
2012-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2012-06-14 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |