DE SB257 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Volume 78, Chapter 349, of the Delaware Laws provided the State the same statutory transfer rights afforded defendants charged with Driving Under the Influence ("DUI"). The ability of both the State and the defendant to transfer misdemeanor DUI charges from the Justice of the Peace Court to the Court of Common Pleas provides for judicial economy and development of a DUI Treatment Court within the Court of Common Pleas. This Act extends the sunset provision included in the original 2012 legislation and extended in 2014 to allow further development of initiatives to address impaired driving in both the Court of Common Pleas and Justice of the Peace Court.
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 349, Volume 78 Of The Laws Of Delaware Relating To Driving A Vehicle While Under The Influence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-29 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 33 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 8 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-15 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 9 On Its Merits |
2016-06-10 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |