DE SB250 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
This Bill is the Fiscal Year 2023 Appropriations Act.
Title
An Act Making Appropriations For The Expense Of The State Government For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2023; Specifying Certain Procedures, Conditions And Limitations For The Expenditure Of Such Funds; And Amending Certain Pertinent Statutory Provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-23 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2022-06-23 | Suspension of Rules in House | |
2022-06-21 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2022-06-21 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 NO | |
2022-06-21 | Lifted From Table in Senate | |
2022-06-21 | Suspension of Rules in Senate | |
2022-06-07 | Introduced and Laid on Table in Senate |