DE SB25 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This Act restricts access to tobacco products and tobacco substitutes to individuals under age 21 by doing all of the following:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11, Title 16, And Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Delivery And Sales Of Tobacco Products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-04-11 | Passed By House. Votes: 25 YES 16 NO | |
2019-04-11 | Amendment HA 3 to SS 1 - Defeated In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-04-11 | Amendment HA 2 to SS 1 - Stricken in House | |
2019-04-11 | Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Defeated In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-04-11 | Amendment HA 3 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-04-11 | Amendment HA 2 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-04-09 | Amendment HA 1 to SS 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-03-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable | |
2019-03-28 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2019-03-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 4 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-03-20 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2019-03-19 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 6 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2019-03-19 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of SB 25 |