DE SB25 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Enact w/o Sign by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act is the second leg of a Constitutional amendment to lengthen the time period during which the Governor must appoint a judicial officer following the occurrence of a vacancy, thereby giving the Governor and State Senate more flexibility in the consideration of vacancies occurring when the State Senate is not in session while preserving the Delaware tradition of quickly filling judicial vacancies. The first leg, Senate Bill No. 275 from the 148th General Assembly, was adopted by two-thirds of the members elected to the General Assembly and publicized in accordance with Article XVI, § 1 of the Delaware Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concurring In A Proposed Amendment To Article Iv Of The Delaware Constitution Relating To The Appointment Of Judges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06 Enact w/o Sign by Governor
2017-04-06 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2017-04-05 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits
2017-04-04 Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
2017-03-30 Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT
2017-03-29 Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2017-03-16 Introduced and Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback