DE SB247 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-30 - Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act, consistent with longstanding practice throughout the State expressly recognized in the existing statute, clarifies the manner in which criminal justice agencies may inform the public of information related to arrests. In addition, this Act provides the State Bureau of Identification the ability to share information with the Federal government to maintain on-going monitoring of individuals who have already undergone background checks. Finally, it provides that fingerprints and similar information collected will be retained for future comparison purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The State Bureau Of Identification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-06-26 Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 7 On Its Merits
2018-06-22 Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
2018-06-21 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-06-14 Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback