DE SB247 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-01 - SS 1 for SB 247 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-01 - SS 1 for SB 247 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill implements portions of the federal requirements in the bipartisan Preventing Sex Trafficking and Strengthening Families Act (P.L. 113-183/HR 4890), signed into law in 2014 and effective September 29, 2015. This bill first implements Section 111 of the federal law which aims to support normalcy for children in foster care by requiring states to implement a “reasonable and prudent parent standard” that allows foster parents to make more day-to-day decisions for youth in their care. The bill addresses the obligations of the caregiver, DSCYF, the youth and the Family Court in supporting normalcy for children. The bill next implements Section 112 of the federal law prohibiting a plan of Another Planned Permanent Living Arrangement for any youth less than 16 years of age and the required Court findings for youth with this plan who are at least 16 years old. Finally, the bill implements Section 113 of the federal law empowering youth age 14 and old in the development of their case plan and transition plan, as well as to have their rights explained to them in an age appropriate manner.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Children In Dscyf Custody.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 247 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-15 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 247 - Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2016-06-09 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 247 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 247 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |