DE SB246 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 14 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House
Pending: House Housing & Community Affairs Committee
Hearing: Jun 20 @ 4:00 pm in House Chamber
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This act provides greater flexibility for County and Municipal governments to enter into public-private partnerships for public lands. These agreements provide opportunities for the preservation of public land and limit the amount of government money required to maintain the land.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Titles 9 And 22 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Counties, Municipalities And Public Lands.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15 Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House
2018-06-14 Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT
2018-06-14 Amendment SA 1 to SB 246 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-06-12 Introduced and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback