DE SB246 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This act provides greater flexibility for County and Municipal governments to enter into public-private partnerships for public lands. These agreements provide opportunities for the preservation of public land and limit the amount of government money required to maintain the land.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 9 And 22 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Counties, Municipalities And Public Lands.
Sponsors
Sen. Harris McDowell [D] | Sen. Stephanie Hansen [D] | Sen. Robert Marshall [D] | Sen. David McBride [D] |
Sen. Nicole Poore [D] | Sen. Bryan Townsend [D] | Sen. Jack Walsh [D] | Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-25 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-07-01 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-07-01 | Passed By House. Votes: 32 YES 8 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2018-07-01 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 246 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-20 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 246 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-06-19 | Re-Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House | |
2018-06-15 | Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House | |
2018-06-14 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT | |
2018-06-14 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 246 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |