DE SB246 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

The Omnibus School Safety Program under Title 29, Chapter 82, 8237(g) requires a yearly progress report to be submitted to the General Assembly by May 31. The Department of Safety and Homeland Security has determined that the due date does not coincide with the school calendar year which ends in June. Often these activities are conducted at the end of the school year when children are out of the building and the teachers/administration can focus on the exercise. A report submitted May 31 cannot accurately report on these specific requirements as some schools would not have had the opportunity to complete these requirements. This bill will amend the report deadline to September 1 of each year. This would enable the report to accurately reflect all schools that have completed all requirements and are in compliance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Omnibus School Safety Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-10SenateSigned by Governor
2016-06-30HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-06-22HouseReported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 8 On Its Merits
2016-06-02HouseIntroduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House
2016-05-19SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-05-11SenateReported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
2016-05-03SenateAssigned to Education Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback