DE SB246 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill amends the membership of the State Emergency Response Commission to allow its members to appoint designees to conduct the regular operations of the Commission. By doing so, the Commission will be able to act more quickly and with full participation of its constituent members. This bill also allows the Commission to create subcommittees as needed.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The State Emergency Response Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-05 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-30 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2012-06-21 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House | |
2012-06-20 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 7 On Its Merits | |
2012-06-07 | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate |