DE SB245 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on September 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act adopts the recommendation of the Behavioral and Mental Health Task Force, established in 2015 by Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 29, to establish a Behavioral and Mental Health Commission to provide oversight and monitoring of the provision of behavioral and mental healthcare in this State. This Act also establishes a Peer Review Subcommittee of the Commission that will serve as a peer review committee to review critical incident reports and treatment records of adult individuals with serious and persistent mental illness who meet the criteria for the target population of the ongoing settlement agreement between the United States and this State regarding the provision of adult institutional psychiatric care. The purpose of the Peer Review Subcommittee is to provide a system of ongoing oversight of the adult behavioral health system to achieve sustained, long-term compliance with the settlement agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Establishment Of A Behavioral And Mental Health Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-06SenateSigned by Governor
2016-06-30HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-06-29HouseReported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
2016-06-28HouseIntroduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2016-06-23SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-06-23SenateAmendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-06-23SenateAmendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate
2016-06-22SenateReported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2016-06-21SenateAssigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback