DE SB244 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-30 - Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill provides technical changes and also creates the Committee on Employment and Social Services consolidating the work conducted by the Welfare Employment Committee and Social Service Advisory Council created by Executive Order Six-Eight signed by then Governor Michael N. Castle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Welfare.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-27 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2018-06-26 Re-Assigned to Administration Committee in House
2018-06-22 Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
2018-06-21 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-21 Amendment SA 1 to SB 244 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-20 Amendment SA 1 to SB 244 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-06-12 Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback