DE SB243 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-11)
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-11)
Status: Passed on September 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Since 1973, § 9605(b) of Title 9 of the Delaware Code (§ 9605) has prohibited the recordation of instruments that restrict the sale, gift, transfer, assignment, conveyance, ownership, lease, rental, use, or occupancy of real property to or by any person because of the persons race, color, creed, sex, national origin, or ancestry.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 9 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Unlawful Restrictive Covenants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-04 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 6 ABSENT | |
2018-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Community Affairs) in House with 7 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-22 | Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House | |
2018-06-21 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2018-06-21 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 243 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2018-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-13 | Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate |