DE SB243 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-11)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House
Pending: House Housing & Community Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Since 1973, § 9605(b) of Title 9 of the Delaware Code (§ 9605) has prohibited the recordation of instruments that restrict the sale, gift, transfer, assignment, conveyance, ownership, lease, rental, use, or occupancy of real property to or by any person because of the persons race, color, creed, sex, national origin, or ancestry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 9 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Unlawful Restrictive Covenants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22 Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House
2018-06-21 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2018-06-21 Amendment SA 1 to SB 243 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2018-06-13 Introduced and Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback