DE SB242 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This Act creates Pay for Success contracts. A Pay for Success contract is an agreement between a State agency and either a program intermediary or an investor under which an investor will provide upfront capital to fund a service, program, or economic development initiative. The State agency agrees to repay the program intermediary or investor if the service, program, or economic development initiative meets the performance measures and outcomes agreed to in the contract. An independent evaluator will determine if the performance measures and outcomes are met.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Pay For Success Contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT
2018-06-27 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2018-06-15 Assigned to Administration Committee in House
2018-06-14 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2018-06-14 Amendment SA 1 to SB 242 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-06-12 Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback