DE SB242 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Passed on August 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-6)
Status: Passed on August 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act creates Pay for Success contracts. A Pay for Success contract is an agreement between a State agency and either a program intermediary or an investor under which an investor will provide upfront capital to fund a service, program, or economic development initiative. The State agency agrees to repay the program intermediary or investor if the service, program, or economic development initiative meets the performance measures and outcomes agreed to in the contract. An independent evaluator will determine if the performance measures and outcomes are met.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Pay For Success Contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-08 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-28 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-15 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2018-06-14 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2018-06-14 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 242 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 4 ABSENT | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-12 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |