DE SB242 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill will require DART to publish all route, schedule and fare information for public transit routes on a website maintained by the Corporation to be available for download by the public and third parties at no charge.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 2 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Powers And Duties Of The Delaware Transit Corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-24 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-09 | Reported Out of Committee (TRANSPORTATION/LAND USE AND INFRASTRUCTURE) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-02 | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House | |
2010-06-01 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-12 | Reported Out of Committee (ENERGY & TRANSIT) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2010-05-04 | Assigned to Energy & Transit Committee in Senate |