DE SB241 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act reorganizes the provision of many forensic sciences into a new Division of Forensic Science organized within the Department of Safety and Homeland Security. The proposed new Division of Forensic Science would consist of the operations previously organized in the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner within the Department of Health and Social Services. Section 1 of the Act reorganizes the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner as the Division of Forensic Science. The Division shall be led by the Director of the Division of Forensic Science, who shall appoint the Chief Medical Examiner and assistant medical examiners and other personnel in the Division. The Director and the Chief Medical Examiner shall be subject to the same personnel policies as other division directors in the department. Employees of the Division must seek prior written approval of the Secretary of the Department of Safety and Homeland Security to maintain employment outside of the Division. Section 1 further creates the Commission on Forensic Science, which shall provide oversight and supervision for the Division. Sections 2 through 5 strike provisions relating to the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner from the chapter governing the Department of Health and Social Services, including certain employment provisions applicable to the Chief Medical Examiner. Sections 6 through 8 create the Division of Forensic Science within the Department of Safety and Homeland Security. Sections 9 through 18 make conforming changes to other titles of the Delaware Code to reflect the new organization of the Division of Forensic Science, including working with the courts and law enforcement (sections 9, 10 and 11), participation on the Criminal Justice Council (section 12), providing fatal incident reviews to the Domestic Violence Coordinating Council (section 13), investigation of deaths (sections 14 and 15), and operating a vehicle or vessel under the influence (sections 16 through 18).
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 10, 11, 13, 16, 21, 23, And 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Office Of The Chief Medical Examiner And The Division Of Forensic Science.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-24 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 35 YES 4 NO 2 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-24 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in House |
2014-06-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 7 On Its Merits |
2014-06-20 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Amendment SA 3 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Amendment SA 3 - Introduced in Senate |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Stricken |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |