DE SB240 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on October 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on October 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [HTML]
Summary
This Act prohibits landlords from renting a dwelling unit that the landlord knows has a current bed bug infestation. This Act also obligates landlords to notify prospective tenants if an adjacent unit or units are currently infested with or are being treated for bed bugs. In addition, the Act sets forth the steps a landlord must take upon receiving notice of an actual or suspected bed bug infestation, including acknowledging the complaint, inspecting or obtaining investigatory services from a pest management professional, obtaining remedial services from a pest management professional, notifying tenants of inspection, remediation, notifying tenants of the pest management professional's determination regarding the infestation, and maintaining a written record of all complaints and control measures provided for a period of 2 years.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 25 And 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Bed Bugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-29 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2022-06-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Housing & Community Affairs) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2022-05-04 | Assigned to Housing & Community Affairs Committee in House | |
2022-05-03 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-04-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2022-04-12 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill SB 240, and Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |