DE SB240 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-01 - SS 1 for SB 240 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-01 - SS 1 for SB 240 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill updates the definition of emergency housing shelter to correlate time frames and program terminology with those accepted by the US Department of Housing and Urban Development, the Delaware State Housing Authority, and current best practices. This will allow emergency shelters to be in compliance with consistent and reasonable length of stay time frames across funding sources and will provide an accurate reflection of present day emergency shelter services and client needs.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Emergency Housing Shelters.
Sponsors
Sen. Bethany Hall-Long [D] | Rep. David Bentz [D] | Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] |
Sen. Gerald Hocker [R] | Sen. Ernesto Lopez [R] | Sen. Charles Paradee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 240 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-22 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 240 - Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2016-06-09 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 240 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-08 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 240 - Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2016-05-19 | Senate | SS 1 for SB 240 - Re-Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Substituted in Senate by SS 1 for SB 240 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |