DE SB24 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-01 - Enact w/o Sign by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on July 1 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-01 - Enact w/o Sign by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This is the second leg of a Constitutional Amendment that will make the Chief magistrate a State Judge under Article IV.
Title
An Act Concurring In A Proposed Amendment To Article Iv Of The Delaware Constitution Of 1897, As Amended, Relating To The Judiciary And The Chief Magistrate Of The Justice Of The Peace Court.
Sponsors
Sen. Thurman Adams [D] | Sen. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Robert Gilligan [D] | Rep. Clifford Lee [R] |
Rep. Peter Schwartzkopf [D] | Sen. Gary Simpson [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Enact w/o Sign by Governor | |
2010-07-01 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-07-01 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2010-06-24 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House | |
2010-06-23 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-03-26 | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2009-03-19 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |