DE SB236 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-17 - Enact w/o Sign by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-17 - Enact w/o Sign by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill removes the provision that allows for the registration of psychological assistants who hold a master’s degree that is “based on a program of studies that is psychological in content and specifically designed to train and prepare psychologists but who is not working toward full licensure as a psychologist.” Pursuant to the bill, a psychological assistant must have completed all the course requirements for a doctoral degree in psychology. A grandfather provision is included for existing registered psychological assistants who maintain their registration. The change limits psychological assistants to those people who meet the experience requirement under 3508(a)(2) for full licensure as a psychologist.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Qualifications Of Psychologists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-17 | Enact w/o Sign by Governor | |
2010-06-23 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 24 YES 12 NO 1 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-16 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-08 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2010-06-03 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-05-12 | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2010-05-04 | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |