DE SB235 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

This Bill is the Fiscal Year 2019 Appropriation Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Making Appropriations For The Expense Of The State Government For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2019; Specifying Certain Procedures, Conditions And Limitations For The Expenditure Of Such Funds; And Amending Certain Pertinent Statutory Provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28 Signed by Governor
2018-06-26 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-26 Amendment HA 2 to SB 235 - Stricken in House
2018-06-26 Amendment HA 1 to SB 235 - Stricken in House
2018-06-26 Amendment HA 2 to SB 235 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-06-26 Amendment HA 1 to SB 235 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-06-20 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT
2018-06-20 Lifted From Table in Senate
2018-06-12 Introduced and Laid on Table in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback