DE SB234 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Assigned to Education Committee in House
Pending: House Education Committee
Hearing: Jun 20 @ 2:30 pm in House Chamber
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

Currently, the ability of the Department to take licensure action (i.e., suspension, revocation, limitation) is, in certain cases, contingent upon the public school employer first taking employment action (i.e., dismissal, termination). The Department believes that its ability, as the agency issuing professional teaching credentials to educators, to undertake licensure action should be separate from any action by the public school employer. Further, the Department seeks to expand the circumstances in which the Secretary may automatically suspend teaching credentials, specifically to include situations involving felony crimes against a children or where there is a clear and immediate danger to student safety or welfare.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Chapter 12 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Limitation, Suspension And Revocation Of Educator Licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15 Assigned to Education Committee in House
2018-06-14 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT
2018-06-14 Lifted From Table in Senate
2018-06-13 Laid On Table in Senate
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-06-07 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback