DE SB234 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Passed on September 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill establishes the offense of Child Abuse. These new statutes combine current statutes and redefine physical injury and serious physical injury to reflect the medical realities of pain and impairment suffered by children. A new section provides special protection to infants, toddlers and children who have disabilities. The statute also expands the state of mind necessary for certain offenses against children allowing for more effective prosecution of parents who subject their children to abuse by others and fail to protect their children. The bill also re-numbers the definitional section making clear that the definitions apply to all crimes in the subchapter. Author: Sen. Blevins

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Offenses Against Children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-12 Signed by Governor
2012-06-28 Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 34 YES 7 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2012-06-26 Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 7 On Its Merits
2012-06-20 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
2012-06-19 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2012-06-19 Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2012-06-19 Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate
2012-06-19 Amendment SA 1 - Stricken
2012-06-14 Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
2012-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2012-06-05 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback