DE SB233 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-22 - Tabled in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-22 - Tabled in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
In January 2021, of the 57 municipalities in this State, the following 12 municipalities had an agreement with the Department of Elections to use the States Voter Registration System to determine if a resident of the municipality is eligible to vote in a municipal election: Camden, Delaware City, Dover, Elsmere, Georgetown, Harrington, New Castle, Newark, Smyrna, Townsend, Wilmington, and Wyoming. Since January 2021, the General Assembly has adopted charter changes authorizing Laurel, Lewes, Milton, and Seaford to use the States Voter Registration System, and Milford adopted an ordinance to do so. The residents of the remaining municipalities are required to register with the municipality before voting in a municipal election.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Municipal Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Tabled in Committee | |
2022-03-23 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |
2022-03-22 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 14 YES 7 NO | |
2022-03-22 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 233 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2022-03-22 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 233 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-03-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-03-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |