DE SB233 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill mandates that the Board of Medical Practice shall adopt rules and regulations establishing guidelines for the imposition of discipline against physicians and the members of other professions regulated by the Board. The Bill gives the Board one year from the date of enactment to adopt these rules and regulations.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Board Of Medical Practice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-30 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-29 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2010-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 9 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-25 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2010-06-24 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-24 | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-23 | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |