DE SB232 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act expands the total number of vice-chancellors on the Court of Chancery to 6 and makes technical corrections to conform existing law to the standards of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Vice-chancellors Of The Court Of Chancery.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-30 Signed by Governor
2018-06-28 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 3 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2018-06-13 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
2018-06-12 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-12 Lifted From Table in Senate
2018-06-06 Introduced and Laid on Table in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback