DE SB232 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 3 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act expands the total number of vice-chancellors on the Court of Chancery to 6 and makes technical corrections to conform existing law to the standards of the Delaware Legislative Drafting Manual.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Vice-chancellors Of The Court Of Chancery.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 3 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2018-06-13 Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
2018-06-12 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-12 Lifted From Table in Senate
2018-06-06 Introduced and Laid on Table in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback