DE SB232 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill will clarify that pari-mutuel wagering is allowed at all types of horse racing events, whether harness racing or horse racing. Author: Senator Ennis
Title
An Act To Amend Title 3 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Harness Racing And Horse Racing And The Use Of Pari-mutuel Wagering At All Race Locations.
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Rep. William Carson [D] | Rep. Gerald Brady [D] | Rep. Helene Keeley [D] |
Rep. William Outten [R] | Sen. Charles Paradee [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Spiegelman [R] | Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-18 | House | Reported Out of Committee (AGRICULTURE) in House with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2016-05-10 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (AGRICULTURE) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture Committee in Senate |