DE SB231 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on July 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation provides a more permanent governance structure for the Delaware Health Information Network (DHIN), by removing the DHIN from the organizational structure of the Delaware Healthcare Commission and by moving toward a more traditional public/private corporation model of governance. The bill also imposes greater accountability and transparency with annual detailed reports to the Governor and the General Assembly, including annual certified audits and a detailed business/sustainability plan. The bill provides for a balanced board, with representation from the healthcare industry and government, including the State’s Director of Management and Budget and the Controller General. This legislation maintains the current law with respect to the protection of the privacy of patient specific information and limitations on liability. This legislation is the product of significant input and effort from the Joint Sunset Committee and its staff, members of the current DHIN Board, members of the Delaware healthcare and business community, the Administration and the primary sponsors of this legislation.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Health Information Network.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-29 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 35 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 5 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-29 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2010-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-24 | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House | |
2010-06-23 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-23 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2010-06-23 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate | |
2010-06-23 | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2010-06-22 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |