DE SB230 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill amends Title 18 of the Delaware Code, ยง 3343, by setting annual reporting requirements for insurance carriers with regard to coverage for serious mental illness and drug and alcohol dependencies.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 And Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-30 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 11 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-27 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2018-06-26 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-06-26 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 230 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-05 | Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate |