DE SB230 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill amends Title 18 of the Delaware Code, ยง 3343, by setting annual reporting requirements for insurance carriers with regard to coverage for serious mental illness and drug and alcohol dependencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 18 And Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Insurance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-29 Signed by Governor
2018-06-30 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-27 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 11 On Its Merits
2018-06-27 Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
2018-06-26 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-06-26 Amendment SA 1 to SB 230 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2018-06-05 Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback