DE SB229 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act acknowledges that the Department of Natural Resources and Environmental Control has been collecting natural resource data for years without the consent of the respective property owners. From the date of this Act forward, the Department must obtain written consent prior to physically entering onto private property for the purpose of collecting Natural Resource Data.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code To Impose A Requirment That Informed Consent Be Obtained Prior To The Collection Of Natural Resource Data On Private Property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20 Reported Out of Committee (Natural Resources) in House with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2018-06-07 Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House
2018-06-06 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2018-06-06 Lifted From Table in Senate
2018-06-05 Introduced and Laid on Table in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback