DE SB229 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Section 1 of the Act would permit the state’s most severely cognitively disabled students, with the consent of their parents, IEP teams, and school districts, to receive special exemptions from taking either of the state’s standardized assessments. The academic progress of those students would still be measured in order to ensure that they are being challenged and provided meaningful instruction. Sections 2 and 3 of the Act attempt to ensure that evidence-based interventions are provided for young students who have dyslexia and related disabilities, to ensure that they are receiving necessary assistance in learning to read.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Education Of Students With Disabilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-06-26 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-26 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-17 | House | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 10 On Its Merits |
2014-06-17 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-06-11 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 3 NO 3 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Amendment SA 3 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Amendment SA 3 - Introduced in Senate |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Amendment SA 2 - Introduced in Senate |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Stricken |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Stricken |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate |