DE SB227 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act brings the Division of Motor Vehicles into compliance with federal law by allowing a commercial learner permit to be issued for a period of up to 1 year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Commercial Learner Permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-16 Signed by Governor
2020-06-24 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2020-06-24 Suspension of Rules in House
2020-06-16 Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House
2020-06-16 Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
2020-06-16 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2020-06-10 Introduced and Laid on Table in Senate

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback