DE SB227 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act promotes the use of primary care by doing the following:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16, Title 18, And Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Primary Care Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-28 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-28 | Rules Suspended in Senate | |
2018-06-27 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-06-27 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 227 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-06-27 | Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-06-27 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 227 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-06-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 2 Favorable, 11 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-14 | Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House | |
2018-06-13 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-13 | Amendment SA 1 to SB 227 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 5 Favorable | |
2018-06-05 | Introduced and Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate |